Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
John A. Chamberlin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ranzenhofer, Michael H., against Michael A. Falkner, represented by Belmont, Amy Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
July 12, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
May 03, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands |
||
May 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
April 29, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.