Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Tonya Solis, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#399442 |
||
April 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 15, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
January 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
March 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 19, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.