Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America Na, Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Bryan Kevm Taylor, represented by Krupnick, Kevin Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
November 02, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
October 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST RATE R&R FILE # 1376639 |
||
October 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1376639 |
||
October 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1376639 |
||
October 11, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1376639 |
||
October 04, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision and Order on Summary Judgment Motion signed by Judge Burns on 10/4/2022. |
||
April 15, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT RJI Assignment Letter |
||
April 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) EXHIBIT C - CERTIFICATE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.