Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maureen Ramirez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greenberg, Alan M., against Gwendolyn Salinger, Jeanette Allen-Kadri, Tarick Kadri, represented by Taylor, James Dalton, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with John F Lambert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn F Lambert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 31, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE LAMBERT (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. JOHN F. LAMBERT |
|
August 31, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) LAMBERT (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN F. LAMBERT |
|
August 30, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 13, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Virtual Conference August 31, 2021 |
||
August 13, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE LAMBERT (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JOHN F. LAMBERT |
|
July 28, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
July 27, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Assignment Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.