Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Joseph Ianniello, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 13, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 13, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: May 13, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
February 01, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL | ||
May 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
May 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
May 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
May 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
May 13, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
May 13, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
March 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.