Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nour Abouhaib, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Hasan Siddiqi, represented by Mack, Barrett D., in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 04, 2022 | AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW | ||
August 04, 2022 | AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 21, 2022 | AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
July 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 30, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.