Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against David Soto Estate Of, Maria Soto As Administratrix Of The Estate Of David Soto, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Richard D Northrup presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard D Northrup Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: January 01, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION - PROOF OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING NO RECEIPT
Date: February 04, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 02, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2021 |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Notice of pendency signed on 3/31/2021. |
||
March 12, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Notice of Motion for an Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Notice of Pendency |
||
March 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
March 04, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #1) Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Richard D. Northrup, Jr. |
||
March 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Def Answer (Soto) and Notice of Appearance (USA) |
||
March 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS and back page |
||
March 03, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for an Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Notice of Pendency |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.