Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Damsky, Edward Jay, Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Tiffany Stevens, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: January 19, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
February 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) WITH SIGNED ORDER |
||
February 25, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
February 18, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 26, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
January 26, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) WITH VIRTUAL HEARING INFORMATION |
||
January 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
January 19, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.