Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Guthrie Medical Group Pc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Susan Preston, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
April 16, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
April 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 12, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
March 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
March 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
March 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.