Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
East Coast Resorts Of America Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Jason J Crapo, Mary Jo Crapo, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 21, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
April 15, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) F. 3215 D2 |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A. Summons.Complaint |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) E. 3215 D1 |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) G. Non.military D1 |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) B. Contract |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) K. Affidavit of facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.