Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Esl Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, against Tricia A Puckett, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Non-Military Affirmation and Search |
||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Service Invoice |
||
April 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
April 01, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing - To new address | ||
January 20, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
January 15, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING |
||
January 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRICIA A. PUCKETT - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
December 28, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.