Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Geico General Insurance Company A S O Alison Riley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fredericks, Jenna Marie, Ginexi, Suzanne Elaine, against Brigette Mabe, represented by Hurd, Jeffrey Earl, Temblador, Nathan Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry F Zwack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 05, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
August 31, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Summary Judgment granted |
||
August 09, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Defendant's Responses |
||
August 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Demands |
||
August 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Responses |
||
August 05, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Summary Judgment |
||
August 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Defendant's Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.