Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, against Lauren Mabb, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.