Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Andrew Campbell, Carol Campbell, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Smalline, Martin D., against Brandon Manson Dc, Kb Chiropractic, represented by Depaolo, Aaron M., O'Connor, Terence P., in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Sara W. Mcginty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara W. Mcginty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Trial Letter and Rules |
||
March 08, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 29, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOTE OF ISSUE WITH JURY |
||
April 12, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Signed Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
April 11, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Preliminary Conference Proposed Stipulation and Order |
||
April 11, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding Preliminary Conference Stip. and Order |
||
March 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 16, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND CPLR 3101(d) Response to Demand for Expert Information |
||
February 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Article 31 Combined Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.