Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
St. Peter'S Healthcare Services, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Paul R Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 05, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 31, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 05, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.