Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mason Plank, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dillon, Matthew James, against John Brownwood, United Parcel Service, Co., United Parcel Service General Services Co, United Parcel Service, Inc., represented by Mullin, Paul Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 02, 2021 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
May 13, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Brownwood |
||
April 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE United Parcel Service, Inc. |
||
April 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE United Parcel Service General Services, CO |
||
April 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE United Parcel Service, CO |
||
April 06, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.