Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Charles F Cowin, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 11, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 27, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 07, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380657 |
||
May 27, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1380657 | ||
May 27, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1380657 |
||
May 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380657 |
||
May 27, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1380657 |
||
April 13, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
April 07, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.