Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Navitas Credit Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against David Richards D B A Dave Richards Tools, David Richards Individually, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Granting Motion |
||
May 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
May 04, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
May 04, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
||
March 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE David Richards |
||
March 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE David Richards d/b/a David Richards Tools |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Agreement Agreement Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Account Verification |
||
March 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Agreement Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.