Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Glenn Macdougal, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 02, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
January 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
January 31, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
January 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
March 16, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.