Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Second Round Sub, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, against Jessica Redfield, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 25, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: April 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: May 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
April 23, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 4/23/2021 |
||
April 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 25, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Jessica Redfield |
||
March 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.