Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Bettyjo Sutton, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 13, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
August 13, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER Redacted |
||
July 15, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 7/15/2021 |
||
July 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.