Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Courtney N Niver A K A Courtney N Mackey, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 06, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 06, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: January 06, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 01, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 08, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 17, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
March 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 17, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
March 08, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 07, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
||
January 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support of Claims Attorney's Fees |
||
January 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support of Default Judgement and Military Status |
||
January 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract |
||
January 06, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.