Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas C Jones, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Natoli, Steven Greig, against Danielle H Jones, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 28, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 25, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 25, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
May 17, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 14, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
May 14, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
May 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
May 14, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.