Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nina Angelina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, against Scott Angelina, represented by Curnalia, Thomas Christopher, Fabrizio, Joann, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
May 25, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
May 24, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
May 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
May 09, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 03, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
March 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
March 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
March 01, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.