Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank N A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Leslie M Rater, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 11, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 07, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
May 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 19, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 06, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.