Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Racheal L Chandler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chiacchia, Daniel Joseph, against Jesus Torres Jr, represented by Renda, Katie Lynn, Zielinski, Richard James, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 01, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) November 30 treatment note with certificate page Redacted per 22 NYCRR November 30 treatment note with certificate page Redacted |
||
February 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
February 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) *Corrected* Photographs |
||
February 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Alstar medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR Alstar medical records Redacted |
||
February 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Bernas CV |
||
February 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) GLPP medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR GLPP medical records Redacted |
||
February 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Dr. Bernas Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.