Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Hsbc Mortgage Corporation, Melissa B Jones, Ripley State Line Truck Stop, Inc., represented by Bailey, Arthur N., in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: June 05, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: June 05, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 05, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 05, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 29, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7) Note and Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #7) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7) Payment History Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #7) Stipulation to Adjourn |
||
May 08, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons and Complaint Redacted |
||
April 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 28, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
April 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
April 28, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.