Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
James Clinton Cribbs Iii, Mary Jude Cribbs, Unistress Corporation Third Party Plaintiff, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wein, Paul Henry, against Corporate Woods Ii Co Lp, Corporate Woods Ii Company Lp, Corporate Woods Llc, Corporate Woods Partners, Gilbane Building Company, (total of 14) See All represented by Arias, John K., Brower, Murry Spencer, Derrico, Donald G., Farrell, Denis Michael, Manson, David B, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with Christina L Ryba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristina L Ryba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-W Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER So Ordered letter from the Court |
||
January 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit |
||
January 12, 2023 | TRIAL DOCUMENTS | ||
January 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Plaintiffs 1.5.23 ltr |
||
January 12, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Hartman 1.12.23 |
||
January 12, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2023 | VERDICT SHEET | ||
January 12, 2023 | JUROR NOTE(S) | ||
January 12, 2023 | JUROR LIST | ||
January 06, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.