Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Imani T Carrasquillo, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 |
JUDGMENT entered by clerk |
||
August 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1385640 | ||
August 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1385640 |
||
August 03, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1385640 |
||
August 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1385640 |
||
August 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1385640 |
||
April 22, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 08, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.