Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Duane P Hufferd, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 23, 2021 |
JUDGMENT entered by clerk |
||
November 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 17, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
June 02, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
May 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.