Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Vc - Veterans Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Eagan K. Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEagan K. Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryVc - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION - Transaction 8948198 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-15-2022:19:12:53 03/15/2022 - Order sent to 6th Judicial District Court via mail |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8948200 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-15-2022:19:15:07 |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court D297 - SC-Graduated-Veterans Court filed on: 02/24/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT GRADUATED VETERANS COURT. COURT GRANTED: DEFENDANT’S CONDITION OF PROBATION IS SATISFIED, IS HONORABLY DISCHARGED FROM PROBATION AND THE CASE IS TO BE DISMISSED. Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
February 03, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/03/2022 Extra Text: N/C - MISSED TEST; PROGRAM EXTENDED 30-DAYS Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
February 03, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
January 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 01/06/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
January 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
December 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/09/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
December 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.