Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 28, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/28/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 14, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/14/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 14, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 31, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/31/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 31, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER EXTENDING PROBATION - Transaction 8961836 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:17:00:48 |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8961840 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:17:01:17 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/17/2022 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT'S PROBATION TERM IS EXTENDED FOR A PERIOD NTE 12 MONTHS. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.