Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryXi - Felony Dui Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
August 30, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
June 21, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/21/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
May 17, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/17/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
April 12, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/12/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM - PROMOTE PHASE 5; MEET WITH SCC JOHNSON IN PERSON TO ADDRESS FINAL REQUIREMENTS Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
April 05, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/05/2023 Extra Text: OWES 1-DAY COMMUNITY SERVICE TO BE COMPLETED ON 04/08; TEAM TO ADDRESS PHASE ADVANCEMENT NEXT COURT APPEARANCE Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 29, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/29/2023 Extra Text: MISSED TEST; 1-DAY COMMUNITY SERVICE TO BE COMPLETED BY 04/08 - SCC JOHNSON TO PROVIDE INFORMATION Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 08, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/08/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
February 08, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/08/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
February 01, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/01/2023 Extra Text: N/C - MISSED TEST; DEFT TO COMPLETE ESSAY AND SUBMIT TO SCC JOHNSON PRIOR TO NEXT COURT HEARING Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.