Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8658643 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-21-2021:16:47:04 |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 9-2-21 OSC MINUTES - Transaction 8658641 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-21-2021:16:46:04 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
3946 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Diversion) ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8632113 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-07-2021:09:40:30 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8632126 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-07-2021:09:43:24 |
|
September 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 09/02/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT IS REMOVED FROM THE DRUG COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPT. NO 10 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS. COURT FURTHER ORDERED: DEFENDANT IS RELEASED ON ANY SPECIALTY COURT HOLD BUT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY DEPT. 10. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
September 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/26/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS ORDERED TO BE PLACED ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD; DEFENDANT IS SET FOR AN OSC HEARING ON 9/2/21 AT 2:00 P.M. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/19/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.