Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Xv - Veterans Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with WALKER, EGAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, EGAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryXv - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/12/2022 Extra Text: MADE REST PAYMENT Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
April 07, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/07/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
April 07, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8960324 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:10:04:26 |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER EXTENDING PROBATION TERM - Transaction 8960321 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:10:03:45 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/17/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM; PROBATION TERM EXTENDED Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/24/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.