Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8941672 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2022:13:55:54 |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
1120 - Amended ... RETURN REPORT FROM SPECIALTY COURTS - Transaction 8941670 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2022:13:55:25 |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) RETURN REPORT FROM SPECIALTY COURTS - Transaction 8932246 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-07-2022:15:22:06 |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8932253 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-07-2022:15:22:53 |
|
March 03, 2022 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 03/03/2022 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFT IS REMOVED FROM THE ADULT DRUG COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO D1 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS. DEFENDANT IS FURTHER ORDERED TO BE RELEASED ON ANY SPECIALTY COURT HOLD BUT IS TO REMAIN IN-CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY 1. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/24/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT TO BE REMAIN IN-CUSTODY AND APPEAR VIA ZOOM NEXT WEEK FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
February 24, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8908895 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2022:13:07:55 |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
3702 - Probation Violation Report DFX: 1ST PAGE SCANNED LANDSCAPE - Transaction 8908890 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2022:13:06:45 |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8793581 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-13-2021:10:51:18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.