Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) Xv - Veterans Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Eagan K. Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEagan K. Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2022 |
CategoryXv - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9579287 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2023:11:43:45 |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE/ORD OF INTENT TO SEAL - Transaction 9579286 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2023:11:43:11 |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
2920 - Ord for Dismissal... AMENDED ORDER OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION AND DISMISSAL - Transaction 9351889 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-08-2022:09:51:13 |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9351893 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-08-2022:09:51:56 |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
2920 - Ord for Dismissal... OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION - Transaction 9224897 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-24-2022:22:44:46 |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9224898 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-24-2022:22:46:55 |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
A710 - Order ... OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION - Transaction 9224897 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-24-2022:22:44:46 |
|
August 04, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court D297 - SC-Graduated-Veterans Court filed on: 08/04/2022 Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
August 04, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court D284 - SC-Graduated/Prob C. Satisfied filed on: 08/04/2022 Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
August 04, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.