Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) RETURN REPORT FROM SPECIALTY COURTS - Transaction 8844855 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-14-2022:11:16:52 |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8844862 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-14-2022:11:17:55 |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8840840 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2022:14:19:07 |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGNAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8840828 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2022:14:17:34 |
|
January 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 01/06/2022 Extra Text: DEFT VOLUNTARILY REMOVED HERSELF FROM THE SPECIALTY COURT PROGRAM; COURT GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS RELEASED ON ANY SPECIALTY COURT HOLD BUT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY DEPARTMENT 8. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
January 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
December 16, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/16/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT; REFUSED TRANSPORT. COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO BE SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 1/6/22 AT 2PM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
December 16, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
November 18, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/18/2021 Extra Text: DEFT IS ORDERED TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY; STATUS HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/16/21 AT 2PM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
3892 - Return of Service B/W FILED 09/27/2021 - SERVED 11/09/2021 - SC - Transaction 8744187 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2021:14:06:18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.