Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER EXTENDING PROBATION - Transaction 9049023 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-16-2022:09:26:15 |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9049026 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-16-2022:09:26:55 |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/12/2022 Extra Text: NOT PRESENT FOR HER ZOOM APPEARANCE; COURT ORDERED: MATTER CONT'D FOR ONE WEEK. DEFT APPEARED ON THE 2PM DOCKET; COURT ORDERED: DEFT'S PROBATION IS EXTENDED FOR 8 MONTHS; ONE DAY C/S IS SUSPENED AND SHE IS TO TEST DAILY. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 27, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/27/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 27, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 13, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/13/2022 Extra Text: ORDERED TO PROVIDE VALID DRIVER'S LICENSE TO SCC WITHIN 45 DAYS; FURTHER ORDERED TO START MAKING PAYMENTS TOWARDS COURT FEES. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 13, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/06/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT HAD A DILUTE TEST; COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO COMPLETE A WRITING ASSIGNMENT RE: DILUTES; DEFT IS FURTHER ORDERED TO ONE DAY C/S; SUSPENDED. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.