Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) Transaction 8967751 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-28-2022:12:39:35 |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8967760 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-28-2022:12:40:07 |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8961844 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:17:02:05 |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8961842 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:17:01:38 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 03/17/2022 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFT IS REMOVED FROM THE ADULT DRUG COURT PROGRAM. DEFT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT NO. 10 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS. COURT FURTHER ORDERED: DEFT IS TO BE RELEASED ON ANY SPECIALTY COURT HOLD BUT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY DEPT 10. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/10/2022 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD; DEFENDANT IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NEXT WEEK. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8936447 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2022:13:05:05 |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
3892 - Return of Service B/W FILED 1-28-2022 SERVED 3-2-2022 - Transaction 8936443 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2022:13:04:40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.