Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... Transaction 8490351 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:16:21:26 |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8490354 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:16:22:26 |
|
June 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D802 - Set in Error filed on: 05/26/2021 Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
June 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 06/02/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS; DEFENDANT REMAINS OUT-OF-CUSTODY. COURT FURTHER ORDERED: DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE TESTING UNTIL HIS COURT APPEARANCE IN DEPARTMENT NO. 10. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
June 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/26/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT NON COMPLIANT DUE TO MISSED TEST; COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT TO APPEAR FOR A WALK-IN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NEXT WEEK. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/19/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT MISSED A COUNSELING SESSION; WARNED NO MORE MISSES. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
May 12, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/12/2021 Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.