Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xm - Mental Health Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Barry L. Breslow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Breslow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryXm - Mental Health Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
2991 - Ord Returning ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8709445 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2021:09:25:13 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8709448 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2021:09:28:15 |
|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 10/19/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS REMOVED FROM THE MENTAL HEALTH COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT NO. 9.; DEFENDANT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY DEPARTMENT 9 ON 11/08/2021 AT 9:00 A.M. Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 10/12/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD AND BE SEEN ON 11/02/2021 AT 14:00 FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
3892 - Return of Service B/W FILED 08/26/2021 - SERVED 10/03/2021 - SC - Transaction 8687607 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-08-2021:10:09:46 |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8687611 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-08-2021:10:10:53 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8616264 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-26-2021:12:59:41 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
1305 - SC-Bench Warrant Filed No Bail SPECIALTY COURT BENCH WARRANT - Transaction 8616260 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-26-2021:12:58:41 (rec'd faxed copy of bench warrant processed on 10-03-2021) - bblough |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.