Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xt - Mat Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryXt - Mat Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) ORDER OF VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL FROM SPECIALTY COURT - Transaction 8471804 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-01-2021:13:12:32 |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8471813 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-01-2021:13:13:51 |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8467224 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-27-2021:11:54:26 |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... Transaction 8467220 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-27-2021:11:51:52 |
|
May 24, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 05/24/2021 Extra Text: COURT GRANTED THE DEFENDANT'S ORAL MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY REMOVE HIMSELF FROM MAT COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT 4 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS; DEFENDANT IS RELEASED ON ANY SPECIALTY COURT HOLD BUT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 24, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
3892 - Return of Service B/W FILED 04-29-2021 SERVED 5-11-2021 - Transaction 8456387 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-20-2021:16:12:21 |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8456392 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-20-2021:16:13:22 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/17/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED SET FOR OTSC 5/24/21 Judge: LYNNE SIMONS |
|
May 17, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: LYNNE SIMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.