Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xt - Mat Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryXt - Mat Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) Transaction 8666673 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-27-2021:10:52:28 |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8666675 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-27-2021:10:53:31 |
|
September 23, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 09/23/2021 Extra Text: COURT GRANTED THE DEFENDANT'S VOLUNTARY REMOVAL FROM DRUG COURT; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT 9 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D802 - Set in Error filed on: 08/26/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT NOT SET FOR TODAY PER DCCM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 12, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/12/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT TO BE PLACED ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD; DEFENDANT IS SET FOR AN OSC HEARING ON 8/19 AT 2PM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8588685 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-10-2021:16:22:36 |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
3892 - Return of Service B/W FILED 03-22-2021 SERVED 08-02-2021 - Transaction 8588681 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-10-2021:16:21:34 |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
3702 - Probation Violation Report Transaction 8581785 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-05-2021:17:31:34 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.