Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xm - Mental Health Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Barry L. Breslow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Breslow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryXm - Mental Health Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8998154 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-14-2022:09:58:36 |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) Transaction 8998152 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-14-2022:09:58:06 |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
2991 - Ord Returning ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8997665 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2022:18:20:34 |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8997666 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2022:18:22:47 |
|
April 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D290 - SC-Graduated/Dismissed filed on: 04/12/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT SUCCESSFULLY GRADUTATED FROM MENTAL HEALTH COURT PROGRAM; COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT SHALL BE RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT FOUR (4) ON APRIL 28, 2022, AT 09:00 FOR FINAL DISPOSITION IN THIS CASE Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/29/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8951571 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-17-2022:10:49:36 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER EXTENDING PROBATION TERM - Transaction 8951567 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-17-2022:10:48:53 |
|
March 15, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/15/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.