Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Connie J. Steinheimer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConnie J. Steinheimer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryRp - Prison Re-Entry Program |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D291 - SC-Graduated 184 Program filed on: 02/15/2022 Extra Text: GRADUATED PRISONER REENTRY SPECIALTY COURT PROGRAM Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
February 15, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 01/25/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 01/04/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
December 21, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/21/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
December 21, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
December 07, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/07/2021 Extra Text: COURT GRANTED TRAVEL PASS TO ARIZONA FOR 7 DAYS UNDER THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS: (1) DEFT PAY IN FULL OUTSTANDING FEES WITH THE DIVISION; (2) DEFT TEST PRIOR TO DEPARTURE AND IMMEDIATELY UPON RETURN; (3) AND DEFT WEAR DRUG TEST PATCH DURING TRAVEL. Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
December 07, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.