Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Hearing |
HP12 - PET/FINAL DISTRIBUTION - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 3/29/2023: Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Transaction 9585266 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-29-2023:17:17:09 |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9585267 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-29-2023:17:17:49 |
|
March 29, 2023 | Hearing |
HP12 - PET/FINAL DISTRIBUTION D445 - Heard - Continued filed on: 03/29/2023 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 3/29/2023: Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting COURT ORDERED: Hearing continued to Wednesday, April 5, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. COURT FURTHER ORDERED: Matthew Winterson is to submit a revised proposed order, to include the information from Document ####-0091 from the Washoe County Assessor’s website. *If the proposed order is submitted prior to the continued hearing, this matter will be approved. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Proof of Service for Notice of Hearing on Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Transaction 9559235 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2023:16:32:34 |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Continuation Exhibits for Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Transaction 9559235 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2023:16:32:34 |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Transaction 9559235 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2023:16:32:34 |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9559237 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2023:16:33:10 |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Transaction 9559235 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2023:16:32:34 |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
2589 - Notice of Stricken Document Transaction 9511031 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-15-2023:08:50:31 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.