Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
1535 - Decree of Discharge Transaction 8987476 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2022:15:05:57 |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8987480 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2022:15:06:41 |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher Voucher - Transaction 8982392 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-05-2022:13:58:46 |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8982414 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-05-2022:13:59:57 |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
1635 - Distributee's Receipt Distributee's Receipt - Transaction 8972413 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-30-2022:12:27:43 |
|
March 30, 2022 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/07/2022 Extra Text: DECREE 4/7/22 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
3515 - Pet for Discharge Petition for Final Discharge - Transaction 8972413 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-30-2022:12:27:43 |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Request for Submission - Transaction 8972413 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-30-2022:12:27:43 DOCUMENT TITLE: PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE (NO ORDER PROVIDED) PARTY SUBMITTING: JUDITH OTTO ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 3/30/2022 SUBMITTED BY: CS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8972417 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-30-2022:12:28:21 |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8964739 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-25-2022:07:57:49 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.