Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | Hearing |
HP23 - PET/TERM/GDSHP - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF ORDER ESTABLISHING CUSTODY AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR RELOCATION OF CHILDREN - Transaction 8739217 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 11-08-2021:16:00:48 |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8739261 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-08-2021:16:01:52 |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
1395 - Citation To Appear HEARING SET: 11/24/21 @ 11:30 A.M. - Transaction 8729397 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-03-2021:10:55:18 |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8729412 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-03-2021:10:56:56 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
3635 - Pet to Terminate Guardianship Transaction 8711126 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2021:17:52:55 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8711129 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2021:17:53:54 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8606372 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-20-2021:12:06:19 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
1910 - Letters of Guardianship AMENDED LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP - Transaction 8606390 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-20-2021:12:14:55 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
1639 - **Document Issued by the Court AMENDED LETTERS - Transaction 8606339 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 08-20-2021:12:05:23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.