Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8330983 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-08-2021:15:32:45 |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
2915 - Ord Dismissal w/o Prejudice Transaction 8330977 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-08-2021:15:31:42 |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
F275 - Bench N/J/T Judgment Reached Extra Text: |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 3-4-21 GUARD - Transaction 8329646 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-08-2021:10:43:01 |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8329654 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-08-2021:10:44:08 |
|
March 04, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR D647 - Petition Dismissed filed on: 03/04/2021 Extra Text: NMILTON/JAVS/C4 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... Transaction 8299744 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-17-2021:16:21:40 |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8299747 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-17-2021:16:22:39 |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8283588 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-08-2021:08:35:37 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.